Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "small business" for the purposes of the Small Business Reserve Program by adding a requirement that the principal office of the business must be located in the State; increasing from 15% to 30% the minimum percentage of a unit's procurements that, to the extent practicable, are to be made directly from small businesses; and altering the intervals within which certain standards and guidelines for participation in the Small Business Reserve Program are to be established to at least every 5 years.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page