Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 870
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring advanced practice registered nurses practicing as an advanced practice registered nurse in the State to notify patients in writing if the nurse does not maintain professional liability insurance coverage or if the coverage has lapsed and no been renewed; requiring that the notification be provided at certain visits and as part of certain informed consents, signed by a patient at certain times, and retained as part of the advanced practice registered nurse's patient records; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0759
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 870
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification Requirements
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 870
Text - Chapter - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification Requirements
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 4:40 PM
Click to return on the top page