Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, DeGrange, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Miller, and Peters
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, for fiscal year 2017, county boards of education shall be relieved of a specified portion of a contribution for specified local employees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; providing for a specified allocation of payment relief; requiring the Governor to provide a specified amount in either fiscal year 2018 or 2019 to be paid into specified accumulation funds of the State Retirement and Pension System if a specified condition is not met; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1109
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499337/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {499337/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Appropriations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/24 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page