Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a charter or code home rule county to enter into a lease without giving certain notice if the lease is not renewable and has a term of 5 years or less.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1481
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0544 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page