Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Brewery and Distillery Licenses
Sponsored by
Frederick County Senators
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in Frederick County a Class DBR brewery license and a Class DDS distillery license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue to the holder of a certain brewery license a Class DBR license, which authorizes the holder to sell certain amounts of beer for on-premises consumption; authorizing the Board to issue to the holder of a certain distillery license a Class DDS license, which authorizes the holder to sell certain amounts of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1377
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Brewery and Distillery Licenses
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {923024/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Brewery and Distillery Licenses
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Economic Matters 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {943327/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page