Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in conjunction with the Office of Health Care Quality, to conduct an assessment of the services provided at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown, comparing the services currently provided to the services provided in fiscal 2015 and to identify whether, on or after July 1, 2015, any services from the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown were reduced or were transferred to the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Easton; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Care Commission - Assessment of Services at the University of Maryland Shore Medical Center in Chestertown
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page