Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Districting Plan
Sponsored by
The President
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the composition of the eight districts in the State of Maryland for the election of members to the United States House of Representatives; and requiring that a certain question be submitted to the qualified voters of the State if the Act is petitioned to referendum under Article XVI of the Maryland Constitution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted (32-12)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Congressional Districting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted (29-13)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Congressional Districting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-13)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {213922/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (42-92)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Congressional Districting Plan
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator King) Adopted (32-12) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator King) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 8:30 a.m.
Text - First - Congressional Districting Plan
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted (29-13) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Congressional Districting Plan
Senate 3/29/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (30-13) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Floor Amendment {213922/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (42-92) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text - Chapter - Congressional Districting Plan
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page