Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators King and Watson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor, the Department of Commerce, and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to each perform certain duties related to defining, identifying, and compiling data regarding the workforce needs in the State and work collaboratively across certain agencies in a certain manner; altering certain requirements for the State Plan of Higher Education; requiring the Commission to establish a Program Review Process Advisory Council; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303827/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Appropriations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page