Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Registered Voter List and Petitions (Ballot Petition Modernization Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations for the secure storage and use of voter data from the list of registered voters and specifying procedures and requirements relating to electronic signatures; establishing and altering certain provisions governing the petition process, including provisions regarding the collection and invalidation of signatures, use of electronic signatures, and attestations by petition circulators; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1109
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Election Law - Registered Voter List and Petitions (Ballot Petition Modernization Act)
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page