Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services; and requiring the Task Force to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {793426/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Judiciary 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page