Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery - Student Information
Sponsored by
Senator Gile
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public schools in the State to notify students taking the ASVAB and parents or guardians of students taking the ASVAB of the option to prohibit the release of a student's ASVAB test scores to military recruiters; and repealing the requirement that certain schools provide certain notice to certain individuals regarding the release of student information and ASVAB test scores.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Education - Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery - Student Information
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery - Student Information
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803429/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery - Student Information
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page