Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority to be the Passages of the Western Potomac Heritage Area Authority; altering and repealing certain duties and powers of the Authority; establishing the Canal Place Preservation and Development Board to manage the Canal Place Properties; requiring the Board, to the extent practicable, to enter into certain memoranda of understanding to delegate the management of certain Canal Place Properties and other projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
Senate 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page