Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Military Training and Military Spouses
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an occupational licensing board to issue a license, certificate, permit, or registration to an applicant who is military trained or who is a military spouse if the applicant meets certain requirements; requiring an occupational licensing board to consider certain types of experience for a certain calculation; and authorizing an occupational licensing board to issue a temporary license, certificate, permit, or registration under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1201
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Finance
Text - First - Occupational and Professional Licensing - Military Training and Military Spouses
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
(   10-1701, 10-1702 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page