Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Amendments Convention Called Under Article V of the U.S. Constitution - Delegation to the Convention
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Carozza, Hershey, McKay, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the General Assembly to appoint a delegation to an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution and an advisory committee under certain circumstances and in accordance with certain requirements; providing for the membership of the delegation; providing for the qualifications, oath, compensation, and duties of a commissioner to the delegation; establishing the operations of the delegation and the advisory committee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Amendments Convention Called Under Article V of the U.S. Constitution - Delegation to the Convention
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
(   10-1701 through 10-1707 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page