Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Sponsored by
Senator M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing to study and make recommendations regarding certain services, programs, advocacy, outreach efforts, and other items to improve the quality of life of individuals who are deaf, deafblind, or hard of hearing; and requiring the Workgroup to submit a report of its finding and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1069
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - State Government - Commission for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {553826/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-3801 through 9-3806 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 10:32 AM
Click to return on the top page