Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Young, Conway, Ferguson, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the tax collector in Baltimore City from selling residential property when the tax in arrears consists only of unpaid charges for water and sewer service; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service if the property is being sold to enforce another lien; requiring the Baltimore City Department of Public Works to report to the members of the Baltimore City delegation to the General Assembly by October 1, 2019, on certain matters; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {989230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {673320/1 (Senator Robinson) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-1)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {989230/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {673320/1 (Senator Robinson) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Ways and Means 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {695769/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-1) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
(   14-801, 14-808, 14-811, 14-849.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page