Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the earning of diminution credits to reduce the term of confinement of an incarcerated individual who is serving a sentence for rape in the first degree in a State or local correctional facility.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page