Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Blueprint for Maryland’s Future – Alterations
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Accountability and Implementation Board)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Education to award funding for a new Judy Center or Family Support Center for planning and development under a certain circumstance; altering the date by which the Accountability and Implementation Board has to conduct and submit an independent evaluation to December 1, 2026; requiring a nonclassroom teacher who pursues National Board Certification to receive certain funding from the State under certain circumstances; altering requirements for the Prekindergarten Expansion Grant Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1426
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Blueprint for Maryland’s Future – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723521/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {803328/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {193021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – Blueprint for Maryland’s Future – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Education – Blueprint for Maryland’s Future – Alterations
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Floor Amendment {803328/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Floor Amendment {193021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Blueprint for Maryland’s Future – Alterations
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page