Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt regulations that require each video lottery operator to adopt specified procedures to offer specified players the opportunity to donate coins when receiving cash on payout to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1537
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion
Subjects
(   9-1A-01, 9-1A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page