Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration Action
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 749
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making certain provisions relating to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor under certain circumstances applicable to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in the event of an adverse immigration action against a parent; authorizing a parent to designate a standby guardian by means of a written designation; providing that the appointment of a standby guardian may not be construed to require the termination of parental rights; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {168276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-3)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-4)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 749
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Immigration Action Against a Parent
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {168276/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration Action
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-3) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-4) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 749
Text - Chapter - Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration Action
(   13-901, 13-902, 13-904, 13-907 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page