Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Reduction in and Exemptions From the School Facilities Surcharge - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending to September 30, 2020, the termination date of certain provisions of law that reduce the school facilities surcharge for certain multifamily housing and exempt certain dwelling units from the school facilities surcharge.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1818
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109031/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate A. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {109031/1 Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Reduction in and Exemptions From the School Facilities Surcharge - Sunset Extension
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing canceled
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing canceled
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate A. Washington) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page