Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity and Gas - Retail Supply - Regulation and Consumer Protection
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an energy salesperson license for certain persons that offer or sell electricity or gas supply agreements to customers in the State; providing for the terms of electricity supplier, energy salesperson, and gas supplier licenses issued by the Public Service Commission; establishing certain licensing and renewal requirements for certain persons; providing for certain disciplinary actions by the Commission against electricity suppliers, gas suppliers, and energy salespersons for certain acts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0267
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/11/2023
Legislative Date
10/11/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/11/2023 10/11/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Retail Supply - Regulation and Consumer Protection
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/2/2024 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page