Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person, at least 60 days before closing on an acquisition of a nursing home, to submit a request for acquisition to the Maryland Health Care Commission and provide notice to residents, resident representatives, and employees of the nursing home; establishing requirements regarding the approval or denial of a request for acquisition; providing for judicial review of a final decision of the Commission regarding a request for acquisition of a nursing home; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803425/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page