Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland State Police Gun Center – Firearms Surrendered Under Final Protective Orders
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Maryland State Police Gun Center to include the tracking, screening, and vetting of all firearms surrendered under final protective orders in the State; and requiring each law enforcement agency to report to the Center the number and type of firearms surrendered, the jurisdictions where the firearms were surrendered, and certain information regarding the individual who surrendered each firearm under final protective orders.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2022
Legislative Date
11/15/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2022 11/15/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland State Police Gun Center – Firearms Surrendered Under Final Protective Orders
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page