Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to provide certain benefits to individuals who take leave from employment for certain purposes; establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring, beginning January 1, 2023, certain employees, employers, and self-employed individuals to contribute to the Fund in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0275
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0375 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8.3-101 through 8.3-1001 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page