Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Delegate Gaines
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that a specified appropriation to Program Open Space representing transfers to the General Fund in fiscal year 2006 may be used only for specified capital purposes related to critical maintenance projects in the Department of Natural Resources and Natural Resources Development Fund Projects in the Department of Natural Resources.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/13/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/13/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
(   13-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page