Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Well Safety Act of 2023
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations by December 31, 2026, to identify additional standards for water quality testing; requiring the Department, subject to certain funding and in consultation with the Department of Information Technology, to utilize an online portal to receive and upload certain information and to provide public access to the information; requiring certain laboratories to submit to the Department certain results of water quality testing; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0250 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Private Well Safety Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Private Well Safety Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Private Well Safety Act of 2023
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments {973322/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Private Well Safety Act of 2023
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-713 )
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page