Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - High Crime Zones - Required Public Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City to post signs reasonably calculated to notify the public of the presence of an area designated as a "High Crime Zone", A "Stop and Frisk Zone", or any similar name; and requiring signs to be placed intermittently around the perimeter of the designated areas to notify the public of the existence and effects of the designation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2016
Legislative Date
10/13/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - High Crime Zones - Required Public Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2016 10/13/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - High Crime Zones - Required Public Notice
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page