Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for partial expungement of certain criminal records under certain circumstances; establishing procedures for the filing of a petition for partial expungement; authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records if the person is convicted of a fourth degree burglary; making the Act contingent on a determination that the technical capabilities of the Judicial Information System and Case Search 2.0 are sufficient to comply with the Act and funding for improvements is available; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0238
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0840 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/16/2018
Legislative Date
11/16/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2019
Legislative Date
1/10/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {802013/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Sydnor and Malone)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
House 1/10/2019 1/10/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {802013/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {218474/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Sydnor and Malone) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-105.1, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page