Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person to be debarred from entering into a contract with the State for 5 years following the issuance of a certain administrative order issued by the U.S. Department of Labor's Administrative Review Board that finds that the person has engaged in certain discriminatory hiring practices in the State.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1363 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:33 PM
Click to return on the top page