Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Invasive and Native Plants – Classification, Listing, Use, and Sales and Use Tax
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke and D. Jones
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to classify certain plants as a tier 1 or tier 2 invasive plant; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to create, maintain, and publish on its website a list of plant species native to the State; requiring that each entity that receives State funding and each State agency prioritize the use of plants native to the State for every planting project; exempting the sale of plants native to the State from the sales and use tax; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0007
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2021
Legislative Date
10/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2021 10/21/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Invasive and Native Plants – Classification, Listing, Use, and Sales and Use Tax
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
(   11-244 )
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page