Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each collector of property taxes to include with each property tax bill a separate insert that describes the Homeowner Protection Program and encourages taxpayers to make a voluntary donation to the Program through a website maintained by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; prohibiting the collector from delivering a certificate of sale to the purchaser of a property at a tax sale until the purchaser has paid a $15 fee to the collector for each certificate issued by the collector; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2023
Legislative Date
10/13/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-34)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-12)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2023 10/13/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (104-34) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2024 2/15/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {623427/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (31-12) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Funding
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 9:44 AM
Click to return on the top page