Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Bagnall, Belcastro, Boyce, Krimm, Ruth, Solomon, Barve, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Lierman, Love, Prettyman, Stein, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter or suitable shade during extreme weather conditions or temperatures, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or during an active winter or cold weather warning; making a violation a civil offense; applying penalties ranging from a warning for a first violation to a fine of up to $1,000 for a third or subsequent offense; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0044
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0081 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/09/2021
Legislative Date
9/09/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-10)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-15)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/09/2021 9/09/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {903122/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (122-10) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {883326/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (118-15) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page