Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for the solicitation of a recurring contribution for a political committee or a recurring donation for an independent expenditure or electioneering communication.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/13/2021
Legislative Date
7/13/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/13/2021 7/13/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 4:47 PM
Click to return on the top page