Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the membership of the Maryland Stadium Authority from seven to nine; and altering the number of members of the Authority needed to constitute a quorum and the number of affirmative votes of the Authority needed to take certain actions.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2021
Legislative Date
9/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2021 9/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Membership
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:24 PM
Click to return on the top page