Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Membership and Official Seal
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Subcabinet for Children, Youth, and Families appoint a member of the State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals; and repealing the requirement that the Board adopt an official seal.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0133
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2021
Legislative Date
10/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2021 10/12/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Membership and Official Seal
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 3:53 PM
Click to return on the top page