Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a prospective bidder or offeror when submitting a bid or offer for a public work contract to submit to the public body a certain contractor safety and health plan and a certain attestation; requiring a contractor safety and health plan to include certain information; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to develop a certain safety and health calculation worksheet and certain safety and health rating system; requiring the Commissioner to adopt regulations to carry out the Act; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0977 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Reassigned to Economic Matters 4 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   17-801 through 17-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page