Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Scholarship Program – Alterations and Maryland Cybersecurity Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain criteria for the Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program, including increasing the number of years a recipient may hold an award, expanding the qualifying positions for a scholarship recipient to fulfill a work obligation, and establishing criteria for part-time students to be eligible for the scholarship, hold an award, and fulfill a work obligation; establishing the Maryland Cybersecurity Loan Assistance Repayment Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0004
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2021
Legislative Date
9/16/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/16/2021 9/16/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Cybersecurity Scholarship Program – Alterations and Maryland Cybersecurity Loan Assistance Repayment Program – Establishment
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page