Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers (Blue Lives Matter Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegates Simonaire, Kipke, Ciliberti, McMillan, Afzali, Shoemaker, Buckel, McKay, Carozza, Glass, and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including law enforcement officers within the scope of specified prohibitions against committing crimes against specified persons, damaging property of specified persons, and burning objects and damaging specified buildings in circumstances exhibiting animosity against persons or groups due to race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, national origin, or status as homeless.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0042
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/04/2016
Legislative Date
8/04/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/04/2016 8/04/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers (Blue Lives Matter Act of 2017)
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   10-301, 10-304, 10-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page