Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Minutes - Required Internet Postings
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public body that votes on legislation to post specified individual votes, the amendments adopted, and reprints of the amended legislation including the language of those amendments interlineated with the text of the bill on the Internet under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/14/2016
Legislative Date
6/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Minutes - Required Internet Postings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/14/2016 6/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Minutes - Required Internet Postings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Subjects
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page