Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Funding and Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Small Commercial Project Trust Account within the Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Reserve Fund; requiring the Governor, in certain fiscal years, to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of at least a certain amount for the Reserve Fund and the Trust Account; altering the aggregate amount of initial tax credit certificates that may be issued for small commercial projects; and extending, from July 1, 2024, until July 1, 2031, the termination date of the tax credit.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0289
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/25/2021
Legislative Date
6/25/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Funding and Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/25/2021 6/25/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Funding and Extension
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page