Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to publish, to a certain extent, health data that includes race and ethnicity information collected by the Office and to provide updates at least every 6 months; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2023, to include an appropriation of at least $1,788,314 in the annual budget bill for the Office; requiring the Cultural and Linguistic Health Care Professional Competency Program to identify and approve certain implicit bias training programs; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0005
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health – Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page