Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Conforming provisions of State health insurance law with existing federal requirements, including updating effective dates for federal regulations, clarifying federal consumer protection regulations resulting from changes to the federal No Surprises Act, altering the material errors that trigger special enrollment periods, and authorizing the Maryland Health Benefits Exchange to adopt an expanded open enrollment period under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0217
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2023
Legislative Date
9/15/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2023 9/15/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments {313923/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2024 2/06/2024 Referred Finance 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/21/2024 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page