Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing the common law crime of indecent exposure; and prohibiting a person from committing the common law crime of indecent exposure within the sight of a minor who is at least 2 years old.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0211 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 3:30 p.m.
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page