Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Attar
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the vehicle excise tax imposed for the issuance of a certificate of title for certain leased vehicles to be a 6% of the capitalized cost reduction and each monthly lease payment; and repealing an exemption from the vehicle excise tax for a vehicle transferred to a lessee who exercises an option under a certain vehicle leasing agreement to purchase the leased vehicle at the end of the lease.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2027
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2021
Legislative Date
10/25/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2021 10/25/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Reassigned to Ways and Means 3 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Reassigned to Ways and Means
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 4:04 PM
Click to return on the top page