Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
Sponsored by
Delegates Watson, Bagnall, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that certain provisions of law related to closed-door meetings of a board of directors of a condominium do not allow the board to withhold or agree to withhold the terms of certain legal agreements from the unit owners; and making unenforceable a provision of a certain agreement that prohibits the disclosure to unit owners or certain purchasers of any term of the agreement.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0030 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/16/2021
Legislative Date
8/16/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/16/2021 8/16/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page