Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the exceptions that allow the sale, distribution, or purchase of tobacco products, tobacco paraphernalia, and electronic smoking devices to or for certain individuals who are active duty members of the military; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to reallocate from one county to another county certain projected unspent grant funding relating to cancer to address certain funding needs; altering the duties of the State Council on Child Abuse and Neglect; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0220
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/13/2023
Legislative Date
9/13/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2024
Legislative Date
1/19/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/13/2023 9/13/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
House 1/19/2024 1/19/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Public Health Services and Protections - Revisions
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2024 2/11/2024 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page