Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the county commissioners or county council to approve a certain referendum request if a valid petition to incorporate a certain area as a municipality is presented by not less than 40% of the registered voters who are residents of the area proposed to be incorporated.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1226 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/15/2021
Legislative Date
7/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/15/2021 7/15/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page