Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Allen, Boyce, Davis, Guyton, Jacobs, Lehman, J. Long, Love, T. Morgan, Nawrocki, and Stein
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing counties and municipalities to designate certain highways in their respective jurisdictions on which a person may operate a golf cart; authorizing a person to operate a golf cart only on a highway with a maximum posted speed limit of not more than 30 miles per hour, between dawn and dusk, only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices, and only if the number of occupants does not exceed the number of seats; and repealing certain authorizations to operate golf carts on highways in certain local areas of the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0316
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2023
Legislative Date
10/12/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2023 10/12/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Authorization
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {823921/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Authorization
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {633621/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Authorization
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:49 AM
Click to return on the top page