Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to include the standards in any requirements that the Council establishes for participation in a higher-performance building program in the State; and defining "State building".
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0236 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:33 PM
Click to return on the top page